MA H4450 | 2021-2022 | 192nd General Court
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Introduced on February 10 2022 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2023-01-03 - No further action taken
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 10 2022 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2023-01-03 - No further action taken
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
That the town of Brookline be authorized to hold hybrid town meetings. Election Laws. [Local Approval Received.]
Title
Authorizing the town of Brookline to hold hybrid town meetings
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-01-03 | House | No further action taken |
2022-05-17 | House | Committee reported that the matter be placed in the Orders of the Day for the next sitting for a second reading |
2022-04-14 | House | Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on House Steering, Policy and Scheduling |
2022-02-17 | Senate | Senate concurred |
2022-02-10 | House | Referred to the Joint Committee on Election Laws |
Same As/Similar To
S2473 (Similar To) 2022-08-08 - Ought NOT to pass (under Joint Rule 10) and placed in the Orders of the Day for the next session
S2530 (Similar To) 2022-02-24 - Accompanied a study order, see S2713
S2529 (Similar To) 2023-01-03 - No further action taken
H4567 (Similar To) 2023-01-03 - No further action taken
H4575 (Similar To) 2023-01-03 - No further action taken
H4083 (Similar To) 2022-01-20 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 4 of the Acts of 2022
S2530 (Similar To) 2022-02-24 - Accompanied a study order, see S2713
S2529 (Similar To) 2023-01-03 - No further action taken
H4567 (Similar To) 2023-01-03 - No further action taken
H4575 (Similar To) 2023-01-03 - No further action taken
H4083 (Similar To) 2022-01-20 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 4 of the Acts of 2022
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/192/H4450 |
Text | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/192/H4450.pdf |