MA H4428 | 2023-2024 | 193rd General Court
Note: Replaces legislation H466
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 7-1-1)
Status: Introduced on February 26 2024 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-03-25 - Read second and ordered to a third reading
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 26 2024 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-03-25 - Read second and ordered to a third reading
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
To promote the inclusion of American Sign Language in the Commonwealth’s public schools
Title
To promote the inclusion of American Sign Language in the Commonwealth’s public schools
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-03-25 | House | Read second and ordered to a third reading |
2024-03-25 | House | Rules suspended |
2024-03-25 | House | Committee reported that the matter be placed in the Orders of the Day for the next sitting |
2024-02-26 | House | Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on House Steering, Policy and Scheduling |
2024-02-26 | House | New draft of H466 |
2024-02-26 | House | Reported from the committee on Education |
Same As/Similar To
H466 (Replaces) 2024-02-26 - Accompanied a new draft, see H4428
S2481 (Similar To) 2023-10-26 - Reprinted, as amended, see S2491
S2491 (Similar To) 2023-10-30 - Read; and referred to the committee on House Ways and Means
H4417 (Similar To) 2024-02-26 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on House Ways and Means
S2481 (Similar To) 2023-10-26 - Reprinted, as amended, see S2491
S2491 (Similar To) 2023-10-30 - Read; and referred to the committee on House Ways and Means
H4417 (Similar To) 2024-02-26 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on House Ways and Means
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/193/H4428 |
Text | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/193/H4428.pdf |