MA H466 | 2023-2024 | 193rd General Court
Note: Legislation replaced by H4428
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 7-1)
Status: Introduced on February 16 2023 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2024-02-26 - Accompanied a new draft, see H4428
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 16 2023 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2024-02-26 - Accompanied a new draft, see H4428
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Relative to the inclusion of American Sign Language in public schools. Education.
Title
To promote the inclusion of American Sign Language in the Commonwealth’s public schools
Sponsors
Rep. Carol Doherty [D] | Rep. Christopher Hendricks [D] | Rep. James Hawkins [D] | Sen. Patrick O'Connor [R] |
Rep. Paul McMurtry [D] | Rep. Shirley Arriaga [D] | Rep. Sally Kerans [D] | Sen. Jacob Oliveira [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-02-26 | House | Accompanied a new draft, see H4428 |
2023-10-20 | Joint | Hearing scheduled for 10/30/2023 from 01:00 PM-05:00 PM in A-2 |
2023-10-05 | Joint | Hearing rescheduled to 10/11/2023 from 11:00 AM-05:00 PM in B-2 |
2023-09-26 | Joint | Hearing scheduled for 10/10/2023 from 11:00 AM-05:00 PM in Gardner Auditorium |
2023-02-16 | Senate | Senate concurred |
2023-02-16 | House | Referred to the Joint Committee on Education |
Same As/Similar To
H4428 (Replaced by) 2024-12-31 - No further action taken
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/193/H466 |
Text | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/193/H466.pdf |