MA H4421 | 2017-2018 | 190th General Court
Note: Replaces legislation H2743
Status
Spectrum: Unknown
Status: Introduced on April 17 2018 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-01-01 - No further action taken
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on April 17 2018 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-01-01 - No further action taken
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
To reduce traffic fatalities
Title
To reduce traffic fatalities
Sponsors
No sponsor information available at this time. |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-01-01 | House | No further action taken |
2018-04-17 | House | Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on House Ways and Means |
2018-04-17 | House | New draft of H2743, H2877 and H3428 |
2018-04-17 | House | Reported from the committee on Transportation |
Same As/Similar To
H2743 (Replaces) 2018-04-17 - Accompanied a new draft, see H4421
S1666 (Similar To) 2018-04-30 - Accompanied a study order, see S2497
H1597 (Similar To) 2018-02-22 - Accompanied a study order, see H4244
H1577 (Similar To) 2018-02-22 - Accompanied a study order, see H4244
S1642 (Similar To) 2018-04-30 - Accompanied a study order, see S2497
S1666 (Similar To) 2018-04-30 - Accompanied a study order, see S2497
H1597 (Similar To) 2018-02-22 - Accompanied a study order, see H4244
H1577 (Similar To) 2018-02-22 - Accompanied a study order, see H4244
S1642 (Similar To) 2018-04-30 - Accompanied a study order, see S2497
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/190/H4421 |
Text | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/190/H4421.pdf |