MA H4379 | 2013-2014 | 188th General Court
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on January 2 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-01-02 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 429 of the Acts of 2014
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on January 2 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-01-02 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 429 of the Acts of 2014
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Relative to the leasing of certain land owned by the Worcester City Campus Corporation
Title
Relative to the leasing of certain land owned by the Worcester City Campus Corporation
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-01-02 | Signed by the Governor, Chapter 429 of the Acts of 2014 | |
2014-12-24 | Senate | Enacted and laid before the Governor |
2014-12-24 | House | Enacted |
2014-12-22 | Senate | Read second, ordered to a third reading, read third and passed to be engrossed |
2014-12-22 | Senate | Rules suspended |
2014-12-22 | Senate | Bill reported favorably by committee |
2014-08-04 | Senate | Read; and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means |
2014-07-30 | House | Passed to be engrossed |
2014-07-30 | House | Substituted for H3444 |
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/188/House/H4379 |
Text | http://www.malegislature.gov/Document/Bill/188/House/H4379.pdf |