MA H4323 | 2015-2016 | 189th General Court
Note: Replaces legislation H1701
Note: Legislation replaced by H4434
Note: Legislation replaced by H4434
Status
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Introduced on May 19 2016 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2016-06-27 - Amended by substitution of a bill with the same title, see H4434
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on May 19 2016 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2016-06-27 - Amended by substitution of a bill with the same title, see H4434
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Relative to the judicial enforcement of noncompetition agreements
Title
Relative to the judicial enforcement of noncompetition agreements
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-06-27 | House | Amended by substitution of a bill with the same title, see H4434 |
2016-06-27 | House | Read second |
2016-06-06 | House | Committee reported that the matter be placed in the Orders of the Day for the next sitting for a second reading |
2016-05-19 | House | Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on House Steering, Policy and Scheduling |
2016-05-19 | House | New draft of H1701 |
2016-05-19 | House | Reported from the committee on Labor and Workforce Development |
Same As/Similar To
H1701 (Replaces) 2016-05-19 - Accompanied a new draft, see H4323
H4434 (Replaced by) 2016-07-18 - Committee of conference appointed (Wolf-Brownsberger-Fattman), in concurrence
S1980 (Similar To) 2015-07-27 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
H3765 (Similar To) 2016-01-27 - New draft substituted, see H3972
S2023 (Similar To) 2015-10-05 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
H3812 (Similar To) 2015-10-15 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on House Ways and Means
H3813 (Similar To) 2016-07-07 - Read; and referred to the committee on Senate Rules
H4434 (Replaced by) 2016-07-18 - Committee of conference appointed (Wolf-Brownsberger-Fattman), in concurrence
S1980 (Similar To) 2015-07-27 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
H3765 (Similar To) 2016-01-27 - New draft substituted, see H3972
S2023 (Similar To) 2015-10-05 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
H3812 (Similar To) 2015-10-15 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on House Ways and Means
H3813 (Similar To) 2016-07-07 - Read; and referred to the committee on Senate Rules
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/189/H4323 |
Text | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/189/H4323.pdf |