MA H4305 | 2023-2024 | 193rd General Court
Note: Legislation replaced by H4762
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on December 14 2023 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-07-08 - Accompanied a study order, see H4762
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on December 14 2023 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-07-08 - Accompanied a study order, see H4762
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Relative to charter school expansion. Education.
Title
Relative to charter school expansion
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-07-08 | House | Accompanied a study order, see H4762 |
2024-02-20 | Joint | Hearing scheduled for 03/01/2024 from 09:00 AM-05:00 PM in Written Testimony Only |
2024-02-05 | Senate | Senate concurred |
2024-02-01 | House | Reported, referred to the committee on Joint Rules, reported, rules suspended and referred to the Joint Committee on Education |
2023-12-14 | House | Referred to the committee on House Rules |
Same As/Similar To
S352 (Similar To) 2024-03-28 - Accompanied a new draft, see S2662
H573 (Similar To) 2024-02-26 - Accompanied a new draft, see H4417
H3116 (Similar To) 2024-04-08 - Read second and ordered to a third reading
H4417 (Similar To) 2024-02-26 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on House Ways and Means
S2662 (Similar To) 2024-03-28 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
H4762 (Replaced by) 2024-07-08 - Discharged to the committee on House Rules
H573 (Similar To) 2024-02-26 - Accompanied a new draft, see H4417
H3116 (Similar To) 2024-04-08 - Read second and ordered to a third reading
H4417 (Similar To) 2024-02-26 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on House Ways and Means
S2662 (Similar To) 2024-03-28 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
H4762 (Replaced by) 2024-07-08 - Discharged to the committee on House Rules
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/193/H4305 |
Text | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/193/H4305.pdf |