MA H4296 | 2013-2014 | 188th General Court
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Unknown
Status: Passed on July 22 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-07-22 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 173 of the Acts of 2014
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Unknown
Status: Passed on July 22 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-07-22 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 173 of the Acts of 2014
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Bill Title: An Act authorizing the commonwealth to reimburse qualifying municipalities for federal military reservation students Section 125 contained in the engrossed Bill making appropriations for the fiscal year 2015 (see House, No. 4001, amended), which had been returned by His Excellency the Governor with recommendation of amendment (for message, see Attachment E of House, No. 4300). July 11, 2014.
Title
Authorizing the commonwealth to reimburse qualifying municipalities for federal military reservation students
Sponsors
No sponsor information available at this time. |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-07-22 | Signed by the Governor, Chapter 173 of the Acts of 2014 | |
2014-07-17 | Senate | Re-enacted and again laid before the Governor |
2014-07-17 | House | Re-enacted |
2014-07-17 | Senate | Emergency preamble adopted |
2014-07-17 | House | Emergency preamble adopted |
2014-07-17 | Senate | Governor's amendment rejected |
2014-07-17 | Senate | Rules suspended |
2014-07-16 | House | Governor's amendment rejected |
2014-07-16 | House | Bills in the Third Reading special report accepted |
2014-07-16 | House | Rules suspended |
2014-07-14 | House | Referred to the committee on House Bills in the Third Reading |
2014-07-14 | House | For message, see H4300, attachment E |
2014-07-14 | Governor returned to the House with recommendation of amendment | |
2014-07-14 | House | Enacted as section 125 of the General Appropriation Bill, see H4001 |
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/188/House/H4296 |
Text | http://www.malegislature.gov/Document/Bill/188/House/H4296.pdf |