MA H4292 | 2023-2024 | 193rd General Court
Note: Replaces legislation S1459
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-1)
Status: Introduced on February 1 2024 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-02-26 - Read second and ordered to a third reading
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 1 2024 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-02-26 - Read second and ordered to a third reading
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Modernizing birth certificates
Title
Modernizing birth certificates
Sponsors
House Joint Committee on Public Health | Rep. Dawne Shand [D] | Sen. Rebecca Rausch [D] | Rep. Lindsay Sabadosa [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-02-26 | House | Read second and ordered to a third reading |
2024-02-26 | House | Rules suspended |
2024-02-26 | House | Committee reported that the matter be placed in the Orders of the Day for the next sitting |
2024-02-01 | House | Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on House Steering, Policy and Scheduling |
2024-02-01 | House | New draft of S1459 and H2273 |
2024-02-01 | House | Reported from the committee on Public Health |
Same As/Similar To
S1459 (Replaces) 2024-02-01 - Accompanied a new draft, see H4292
H2273 (Similar To) 2024-02-01 - Accompanied a new draft, see H4292
H4139 (Similar To) 2024-07-18 - Accompanied H4885
H4135 (Similar To) 2023-10-18 - Published as amended, see H4139
H4152 (Similar To) 2024-05-09 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on House Ways and Means
H4885 (Similar To) 2024-07-25 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 135 of the Acts of 2024
H2273 (Similar To) 2024-02-01 - Accompanied a new draft, see H4292
H4139 (Similar To) 2024-07-18 - Accompanied H4885
H4135 (Similar To) 2023-10-18 - Published as amended, see H4139
H4152 (Similar To) 2024-05-09 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on House Ways and Means
H4885 (Similar To) 2024-07-25 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 135 of the Acts of 2024
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/193/H4292 |
Text | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/193/H4292.pdf |