MA H4284 | 2021-2022 | 192nd General Court
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on April 15 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-04-15 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 46 of the Acts of 2022
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on April 15 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-04-15 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 46 of the Acts of 2022
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
That the city of Northampton be authorized to appoint members to the Northampton License Commission without regard to party affiliation. Consumer Protection and Professional Licensure. [Local Approval Received.]
Title
Exempting the city of Northampton from appointments to the Northampton License Commission on the basis of party affiliation
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-04-15 | Signed by the Governor, Chapter 46 of the Acts of 2022 | |
2022-04-11 | Senate | Enacted and laid before the Governor |
2022-04-11 | House | Enacted |
2022-04-07 | Senate | Read third (title changed) and passed to be engrossed |
2022-04-07 | Senate | Taken out of the Orders of the Day |
2022-03-31 | Senate | Read second and ordered to a third reading |
2022-03-14 | Senate | Read; and placed in the Orders of the Day for the next session |
2022-03-10 | House | Read third and passed to be engrossed |
2022-02-09 | House | Read second and ordered to a third reading |
2022-02-09 | House | Rules suspended |
2022-02-09 | House | Committee reported that the matter be placed in the Orders of the Day for the next sitting |
2022-02-07 | House | Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on House Steering, Policy and Scheduling |
2022-01-03 | Joint | Hearing scheduled for 01/10/2022 from 01:00 PM-03:00 PM in Virtual Hearing |
2022-01-03 | Joint | Hearing canceled – new hearing TBD |
2022-01-03 | Joint | Hearing scheduled for 01/10/2022 from 01:00 PM-03:00 PM in Virtual Hearing |
2021-12-16 | Senate | Senate concurred |
2021-12-13 | House | Referred to the Joint Committee on Consumer Protection and Professional Licensure |
Same As/Similar To
H830 (Similar To) 2022-09-26 - Accompanied a study order, see H5284
H832 (Similar To) 2022-09-12 - Accompanied a study order, see H5026
H831 (Similar To) 2022-09-12 - Accompanied a study order, see H5026
H2202 (Similar To) 2021-07-26 - Amended by substitution of a bill with the same title, H3995
H3900 (Similar To) 2022-02-16 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 24 of the Acts of 2022
H832 (Similar To) 2022-09-12 - Accompanied a study order, see H5026
H831 (Similar To) 2022-09-12 - Accompanied a study order, see H5026
H2202 (Similar To) 2021-07-26 - Amended by substitution of a bill with the same title, H3995
H3900 (Similar To) 2022-02-16 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 24 of the Acts of 2022
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/192/H4284 |
Text | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/192/H4284.pdf |