MA H4280 | 2019-2020 | 191st General Court
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Introduced on December 19 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-01-27 - Bill reported favorably by committee as changed and referred to the committee on House Ways and Means
Pending: House Ways and Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on December 19 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-01-27 - Bill reported favorably by committee as changed and referred to the committee on House Ways and Means
Pending: House Ways and Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
For legislation to authorize the Department of Children and Families to establish an electronic repository of foster youths educational records. Children, Families and Persons with Disabilities.
Title
Creating an electronic backpack for foster children
Sponsors
Rep. Kay Khan [D] | Sen. Rebecca Rausch [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-01-27 | House | Bill reported favorably by committee as changed and referred to the committee on House Ways and Means |
2020-01-03 | Joint | Hearing scheduled for 01/13/2020 from 10:30 AM-01:00 PM in B-1 |
2019-12-30 | Senate | Senate concurred |
2019-12-26 | House | Reported, referred to the committee on Joint Rules, reported, rules suspended and referred to the Joint Committee on Children, Families and Persons with Disabilities |
2019-12-19 | House | Referred to the committee on House Rules |
Same As/Similar To
S40 (Similar To) 2020-02-13 - Accompanied a study order, see S2532
S46 (Similar To) 2019-12-02 - Bill reported favorably by committee as changed and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
H91 (Similar To) 2020-11-04 - Accompanied a study order, see H5088
S46 (Similar To) 2019-12-02 - Bill reported favorably by committee as changed and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
H91 (Similar To) 2020-11-04 - Accompanied a study order, see H5088
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/191/H4280 |
Text | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/191/H4280.pdf |