MA H4274 | 2015-2016 | 189th General Court
Note: Replaces legislation H3044
Status
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Introduced on May 11 2016 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2016-05-11 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on House Ways and Means
Pending: House Ways and Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on May 11 2016 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2016-05-11 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on House Ways and Means
Pending: House Ways and Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Relative to licensing and operating requirements of automobile inspection stations
Title
Relative to licensing and operating requirements of automobile inspection stations
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-05-11 | House | Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on House Ways and Means |
2016-05-11 | House | New draft of H3044 |
2016-05-11 | House | Reported from the committee on Transportation |
Same As/Similar To
H3044 (Replaces) 2016-05-11 - Accompanied a new draft, see H4274
H3613 (Similar To) 2015-06-24 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on House Ways and Means
H3692 (Similar To) 2015-07-29 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on House Ways and Means
S2032 (Similar To) 2016-01-21 - New draft substituted as amended, see S2093
S2088 (Similar To) 2016-01-11 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
S2178 (Similar To) 2016-03-16 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
H3613 (Similar To) 2015-06-24 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on House Ways and Means
H3692 (Similar To) 2015-07-29 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on House Ways and Means
S2032 (Similar To) 2016-01-21 - New draft substituted as amended, see S2093
S2088 (Similar To) 2016-01-11 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
S2178 (Similar To) 2016-03-16 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/189/H4274 |
Text | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/189/H4274.pdf |