MA H4260 | 2011-2012 | 187th General Court
Status
Spectrum: Unknown
Status: Introduced on July 12 2012 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2012-07-17 - Report accepted, in concurrence
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on July 12 2012 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2012-07-17 - Report accepted, in concurrence
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Message from His Excellency the Governor submitting the “Tribal State Compact between the Mashpee Wampanoag Tribe and the Commonwealth of Massachusetts”. July 12, 2012.
Title
Tribal State Compact between the Mashpee Wampanoag Tribe and the Commonwealth
Sponsors
No sponsor information available at this time. |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-07-17 | Senate | Report accepted, in concurrence |
2012-07-16 | House | Report accepted |
2012-07-16 | House | Committee recommended placed on file |
2012-07-13 | Joint | Hearing scheduled for 07/16/2012 from 11:00 AM-01:00 PM in B-1 |
2012-07-13 | Senate | Senate concurred |
2012-07-12 | House | Referred to the Joint Committee on Economic Development and Emerging Technologies |
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://www.malegislature.gov/Bills/187/House/H4260 |
Text | http://www.malegislature.gov/Bills/PDF?billId=119424&generalCourtId=1 |