MA H4254 | 2021-2022 | 192nd General Court
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on November 15 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-11-15 - Adopted
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on November 15 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-11-15 - Adopted
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Filed by Mr. Galvin of Canton. November 15, 2021.
Title
Order relative to H4248, An Act enhancing the market review process
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-11-15 | House | Adopted |
2021-11-15 | House | Committee recommended ought to be adopted |
2021-11-15 | House | Reported from the committee on House Rules |
Same As/Similar To
S1256 (Similar To) 2022-03-03 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
H1608 (Similar To) 2022-06-09 - Accompanied a study order, see H4844
H69 (Similar To) 2021-02-23 - Adopted
H3931 (Similar To) 2021-07-06 - Adopted
H5021 (Similar To) 2022-09-01 - Adopted, in concurrence
H1550 (Similar To) 2022-06-09 - Accompanied a study order, see H4844
H1608 (Similar To) 2022-06-09 - Accompanied a study order, see H4844
H69 (Similar To) 2021-02-23 - Adopted
H3931 (Similar To) 2021-07-06 - Adopted
H5021 (Similar To) 2022-09-01 - Adopted, in concurrence
H1550 (Similar To) 2022-06-09 - Accompanied a study order, see H4844
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/192/H4254 |
Text | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/192/H4254.pdf |