MA H1608 | 2021-2022 | 192nd General Court

Note: Legislation replaced by H4844

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 4-0)
Status: Introduced on March 29 2021 - 25% progression
Action: 2022-06-09 - Accompanied a study order, see H4844
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

Relative to violent protection orders. The Judiciary.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Relative to violent protection order violations

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2022-06-09HouseAccompanied a study order, see H4844
2021-09-16JointHearing scheduled for 09/23/2021 from 11:00 AM-02:00 PM in Virtual Hearing
2021-03-29SenateSenate concurred
2021-03-29HouseReferred to the Joint Committee on The Judiciary

Same As/Similar To

S42 (Similar To) 2022-07-05 - New draft substituted (Tarr), see S2978
H3520 (Similar To) 2021-12-09 - Read second and ordered to a third reading
H3393 (Similar To) 2022-01-11 - Hearing scheduled for 01/19/2022 from 03:00 PM-06:00 PM in Virtual Hearing
S976 (Similar To) 2022-07-07 - Accompanied S1057
S2288 (Similar To) 2022-02-10 - Read second and ordered to a third reading
S1545 (Similar To) 2022-03-17 - Accompanied a study order, see S2768
S1099 (Similar To) 2022-02-07 - Accompanied a study order, see S2665
S996 (Similar To) 2022-04-19 - Accompanied a study order, see S2838
S1324 (Similar To) 2022-01-31 - Accompanied a study order, see S2630
S1057 (Similar To) 2022-07-07 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
S2101 (Similar To) 2021-07-21 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
H4844 (Replaced by) 2022-06-09 - Discharged to the committee on House Rules

Massachusetts State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback