MA H424 | 2021-2022 | 192nd General Court
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Introduced on March 29 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2023-01-03 - No further action taken
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on March 29 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2023-01-03 - No further action taken
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Relative to the licensing of swimming pool builders and service contractors. Consumer Protection and Professional Licensure.
Title
Relative to the licensure of swimming pool builders and service contractors
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-01-03 | House | No further action taken |
2021-11-10 | House | Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on House Ways and Means |
2021-06-28 | Joint | Hearing scheduled for 07/08/2021 from 01:00 PM-03:00 PM in Virtual Hearing |
2021-03-29 | Senate | Senate concurred |
2021-03-29 | House | Referred to the Joint Committee on Consumer Protection and Professional Licensure |
Same As/Similar To
S241 (Similar To) 2021-11-10 - Accompanied a new draft, see H4242
S240 (Similar To) 2021-11-10 - Accompanied a new draft, see H4242
H327 (Similar To) 2021-11-10 - Accompanied a new draft, see H4242
H4017 (Similar To) 2021-08-03 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 34 of the Acts of 2021
S1374 (Similar To) 2022-02-16 - Accompanied a new draft, see H4464
S195 (Similar To) 2022-02-07 - Accompanied a study order, see S2666
S237 (Similar To) 2022-03-31 - Accompanied a study order, see S2800
S713 (Similar To) 2022-06-09 - Accompanied a study order, see S2917
S219 (Similar To) 2021-11-08 - Accompanied a new draft, see S2571
H5094 (Similar To) 2022-11-10 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 263 of the Acts of 2022
S240 (Similar To) 2021-11-10 - Accompanied a new draft, see H4242
H327 (Similar To) 2021-11-10 - Accompanied a new draft, see H4242
H4017 (Similar To) 2021-08-03 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 34 of the Acts of 2021
S1374 (Similar To) 2022-02-16 - Accompanied a new draft, see H4464
S195 (Similar To) 2022-02-07 - Accompanied a study order, see S2666
S237 (Similar To) 2022-03-31 - Accompanied a study order, see S2800
S713 (Similar To) 2022-06-09 - Accompanied a study order, see S2917
S219 (Similar To) 2021-11-08 - Accompanied a new draft, see S2571
H5094 (Similar To) 2022-11-10 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 263 of the Acts of 2022
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/192/H424 |
Text | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/192/H424.pdf |