MA H4227 | 2017-2018 | 190th General Court
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on July 25 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-07-25 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 150 of the Acts of 2018
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on July 25 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-07-25 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 150 of the Acts of 2018
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
For legislation to authorize the county commissioners of Bristol County to borrow money for the repair, renovation and construction, equipping and furnishing of buildings at Bristol County Agricultural High School in the town of Dighton. Municipalities and Regional Government.
Title
Authorizing the Bristol County Commissioners to borrow money for the repair, renovation and construction, equipping and furnishing of buildings at Bristol County Agricultural School in the town of Dighton
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-07-25 | Signed by the Governor, Chapter 150 of the Acts of 2018 | |
2018-07-16 | Senate | Enacted and laid before the Governor |
2018-07-16 | House | Enacted |
2018-07-16 | Senate | Read second, ordered to a third reading, read third (title changed) and passed to be engrossed |
2018-07-16 | Senate | Rules suspended |
2018-07-16 | Senate | Committee reported that the matter be placed in the Orders of the Day for the next session |
2018-03-29 | Senate | Read and referred to the committee on Senate Rules |
2018-03-26 | House | Read third and passed to be engrossed |
2018-03-01 | House | Read second and ordered to a third reading |
2018-03-01 | House | Rules suspended |
2018-03-01 | House | Committee reported that the matter be placed in the Orders of the Day for the next sitting |
2018-02-26 | House | Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on House Steering, Policy and Scheduling |
2018-02-12 | Senate | Senate concurred |
2018-02-07 | House | Reported, referred to the committee on Joint Rules, reported, rules suspended and referred to the Joint Committee on Municipalities and Regional Government |
2018-01-31 | House | Referred to the committee on House Rules |
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/190/H4227 |
Text | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/190/H4227.pdf |