MA H4227 | 2015-2016 | 189th General Court
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Introduced on April 19 2016 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2016-05-19 - Report accepted
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on April 19 2016 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2016-05-19 - Report accepted
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Relative to authorizing the election of a charter commission in the city of Medford. Election Laws. [Local Approval Received.]
Title
Authorizing the election of a charter commission in the city of Medford at the state election (presidential election) to take place on November 8, 2016
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-05-19 | House | Report accepted |
2016-05-19 | House | Rules suspended |
2016-05-19 | House | Committee reported that the matter be placed in the Orders of the Day for the next sitting, the question being on acceptance |
2016-05-19 | House | Committee recommended ought NOT to pass and referred to the committee on House Steering, Policy and Scheduling |
2016-04-21 | Senate | Senate concurred |
2016-04-19 | House | Referred to the Joint Committee on Election Laws |
Same As/Similar To
H2976 (Similar To) 2016-01-11 - Accompanied H3095
H1833 (Similar To) 2016-09-12 - Accompanied a study order, see H4606
H983 (Similar To) 2016-09-26 - Accompanied a study order, see H4635
H650 (Similar To) 2016-09-29 - Accompanied a study order, see H4653
H177 (Similar To) 2016-07-23 - Senate concurred
H4752 (Similar To) 2016-12-22 - Accompanied a new draft, see H4769
H1833 (Similar To) 2016-09-12 - Accompanied a study order, see H4606
H983 (Similar To) 2016-09-26 - Accompanied a study order, see H4635
H650 (Similar To) 2016-09-29 - Accompanied a study order, see H4653
H177 (Similar To) 2016-07-23 - Senate concurred
H4752 (Similar To) 2016-12-22 - Accompanied a new draft, see H4769
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/189/H4227 |
Text | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/189/H4227.pdf |