MA H4214 | 2013-2014 | 188th General Court
Note: Replaces legislation H882
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on January 6 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-01-06 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 456 of the Acts of 2014
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on January 6 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-01-06 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 456 of the Acts of 2014
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Relative to insurance holding companies
Title
Relative to insurance holding companies
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-01-06 | Signed by the Governor, Chapter 456 of the Acts of 2014 | |
2014-12-31 | Senate | Enacted and laid before the Governor |
2014-12-31 | House | Enacted |
2014-12-31 | Senate | Read second, ordered to a third reading, read third and passed to be engrossed |
2014-12-31 | Senate | Rules suspended |
2014-12-31 | Senate | Committee recommended ought to pass |
2014-12-11 | Senate | Read; and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means |
2014-12-08 | House | Read third and passed to be engrossed |
2014-06-25 | House | Ordered to a third reading |
2014-06-25 | House | Substituted for H882 |
2014-06-23 | House | New draft of H882 |
2014-06-23 | House | Reported from the committee on House Ways and Means |
Same As/Similar To
H882 (Replaces) 2014-06-25 - New draft substituted, see H4214
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/188/House/H4214 |
Text | http://www.malegislature.gov/Document/Bill/188/House/H4214.pdf |