MA H4210 | 2023-2024 | 193rd General Court
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on October 16 2023 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-03-04 - Read second and ordered to a third reading
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on October 16 2023 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-03-04 - Read second and ordered to a third reading
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
By Representative Cutler of Pembroke, a petition (subject to Joint Rule 12) of Josh S. Cutler and Matthew NeJame for the issuance of an annual proclamation by the Governor to designate October 2 as learning disability screening day. State Administration and Regulatory Oversight.
Title
Establishing Massachusetts Learning Disability Screening Day
Sponsors
Rep. Josh Cutler [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-03-04 | House | Read second and ordered to a third reading |
2024-03-04 | House | Rules suspended |
2024-03-04 | House | Committee reported that the matter be placed in the Orders of the Day for the next sitting |
2024-02-05 | House | Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on House Steering, Policy and Scheduling |
2024-01-26 | Joint | Hearing scheduled for 02/01/2024 from 11:00 AM-01:00 PM in A-2 |
2023-12-11 | Senate | Senate concurred |
2023-12-07 | House | Reported, referred to the committee on Joint Rules, reported, rules suspended and referred to the Joint Committee on State Administration and Regulatory Oversight |
2023-10-16 | House | Referred to the committee on House Rules |
Same As/Similar To
H4540 (Similar To) 2024-04-16 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on House Ways and Means
H4632 (Similar To) 2024-05-13 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on House Ways and Means
H4743 (Similar To) 2024-06-13 - Published as amended, see H4758
H4758 (Similar To) 2024-07-31 - Committee of conference appointed (Crighton-Velis-Fattman), in concurrence
H4785 (Similar To) 2024-07-31 - Committee of conference appointed (Friedman-Miranda-O'Connor), in concurrence
H4632 (Similar To) 2024-05-13 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on House Ways and Means
H4743 (Similar To) 2024-06-13 - Published as amended, see H4758
H4758 (Similar To) 2024-07-31 - Committee of conference appointed (Crighton-Velis-Fattman), in concurrence
H4785 (Similar To) 2024-07-31 - Committee of conference appointed (Friedman-Miranda-O'Connor), in concurrence
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/193/H4210 |
Text | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/193/H4210.pdf |