MA H4207 | 2019-2020 | 191st General Court
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Passed on April 15 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-04-15 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 63 of the Acts of 2020
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Passed on April 15 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-04-15 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 63 of the Acts of 2020
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
For legislation to designate a certain bridge on Salem Street in the city of Woburn as the Angelo Piazza bridge. Transportation.
Title
Designating a certain bridge in the city of Woburn as the Angelo Piazza Bridge
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-04-15 | Signed by the Governor, Chapter 63 of the Acts of 2020 | |
2020-04-09 | Senate | Enacted and laid before the Governor |
2020-04-09 | House | Enacted |
2020-04-06 | Senate | Read second, ordered to a third reading, read third and passed to be engrossed |
2020-04-06 | Senate | Rules suspended |
2020-04-06 | Senate | Committee reported that the matter be placed in the Orders of the Day for the next session |
2020-03-16 | Senate | Read; and referred to the committee on Senate Rules |
2020-03-12 | House | Read third and passed to be engrossed |
2020-02-10 | House | Read second and ordered to a third reading |
2020-02-10 | House | Rules suspended |
2020-02-10 | House | Committee reported that the matter be placed in the Orders of the Day for the next sitting |
2020-02-05 | House | Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on House Steering, Policy and Scheduling |
2019-12-23 | Joint | Hearing scheduled for 01/02/2020 from 10:00 AM-04:00 PM in A-1 |
2019-11-18 | Senate | Senate concurred |
2019-11-14 | House | Reported, referred to the committee on Joint Rules, reported, rules suspended and referred to the Joint Committee on Transportation |
2019-10-31 | House | Referred to the committee on House Rules |
Same As/Similar To
H4206 (Similar To) 2020-11-10 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 202 of the Acts of 2020
S2135 (Similar To) 2019-06-10 - Accompanied a new draft, see S2244
H3067 (Similar To) 2019-07-31 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 46 of the Acts of 2019
S2132 (Similar To) 2020-12-29 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 251 of the Acts of 2020
H3191 (Similar To) 2020-11-20 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 211 of the Acts of 2020
S2135 (Similar To) 2019-06-10 - Accompanied a new draft, see S2244
H3067 (Similar To) 2019-07-31 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 46 of the Acts of 2019
S2132 (Similar To) 2020-12-29 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 251 of the Acts of 2020
H3191 (Similar To) 2020-11-20 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 211 of the Acts of 2020
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/191/H4207 |
Text | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/191/H4207.pdf |