MA S2132 | 2019-2020 | 191st General Court

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Introduced on January 22 2019 - 25% progression
Action: 2019-09-11 - Hearing scheduled for 09/17/2019 from 11:00 AM-01:00 PM in B-1
Pending: Joint Transportation Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

For legislation to designate a certain bridge in the city of Taunton the PFC Aaron Cordoba-Martinez Bridge. Transportation.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Designating a certain bridge in the city of Taunton the PFC Aaron Cordoba-Martinez Bridge

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2019-09-11JointHearing scheduled for 09/17/2019 from 11:00 AM-01:00 PM in B-1
2019-01-22HouseHouse concurred
2019-01-22SenateReferred to the Joint Committee on Transportation

Same As/Similar To

S2135 (Similar To) 2019-06-10 - Accompanied a new draft, see S2244
H3191 (Similar To) 2019-01-22 - Senate concurred
H3067 (Similar To) 2019-07-31 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 46 of the Acts of 2019
H3170 (Similar To) 2019-08-12 - Read; and referred to the committee on Senate Rules
S1897 (Similar To) 2019-09-16 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
H3743 (Similar To) 2019-09-11 - Hearing scheduled for 09/17/2019 from 11:00 AM-01:00 PM in B-1
S2244 (Similar To) 2019-06-20 - New draft substituted (Rush), see S2272
S2272 (Similar To) 2019-07-25 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 36 of the Acts of 2019

Massachusetts State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback