MA S1897 | 2019-2020 | 191st General Court
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 22 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-09-16 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
Pending: Senate Ways and Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 22 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-09-16 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
Pending: Senate Ways and Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
For legislation to authorize the transfer of a certain parcel of land in the city of Taunton. State Administration and Regulatory Oversight.
Title
Authorizing the transfer of a parcel of land in the city of Taunton
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-09-16 | Senate | Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means |
2019-03-25 | Joint | Hearing scheduled for 04/01/2019 from 01:00 PM-03:00 PM in A-1 |
2019-01-22 | House | House concurred |
2019-01-22 | Senate | Referred to the Joint Committee on State Administration and Regulatory Oversight |
Same As/Similar To
S1199 (Similar To) 2020-09-28 - Read; and referred to the committee on House Steering, Policy and Scheduling
H2744 (Similar To) 2020-11-06 - Accompanied a study order, see H5103
H2791 (Similar To) 2019-09-16 - Accompanied S1881
S2202 (Similar To) 2019-06-05 - Accompanied H3698
H3698 (Similar To) 2020-03-05 - Amended by substitution of a bill with the same title, H4545
H3915 (Similar To) 2020-07-30 - New draft substituted, see H4920
H3956 (Similar To) 2019-11-06 - New draft substituted, see H4178
H4009 (Similar To) 2020-06-04 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 88 of the Acts of 2020
S2445 (Similar To) 2020-04-16 - New draft substituted, see S2636
H2744 (Similar To) 2020-11-06 - Accompanied a study order, see H5103
H2791 (Similar To) 2019-09-16 - Accompanied S1881
S2202 (Similar To) 2019-06-05 - Accompanied H3698
H3698 (Similar To) 2020-03-05 - Amended by substitution of a bill with the same title, H4545
H3915 (Similar To) 2020-07-30 - New draft substituted, see H4920
H3956 (Similar To) 2019-11-06 - New draft substituted, see H4178
H4009 (Similar To) 2020-06-04 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 88 of the Acts of 2020
S2445 (Similar To) 2020-04-16 - New draft substituted, see S2636
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/191/S1897 |
Text | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/191/S1897.pdf |