MA H4192 | 2021-2022 | 192nd General Court
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Introduced on October 4 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2023-01-03 - No further action taken
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on October 4 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2023-01-03 - No further action taken
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
That the town of Eastham be authorized to convey a conservation restriction on a certain parcel of land to the Eastham Conservation Foundation, Inc. Municipalities and Regional Government. [Local Approval Received.]
Title
Authorizing the town of Eastham, acting by and through its board of selectmen, to convey a conservation restriction on a certain parcel of land to the Eastham conservation foundation, inc
Sponsors
Rep. Sarah Peake [D] | Sen. Julian Cyr [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-01-03 | House | No further action taken |
2021-11-02 | House | Read second and ordered to a third reading |
2021-11-02 | House | Rules suspended |
2021-11-02 | House | Committee reported that the matter be placed in the Orders of the Day for the next sitting |
2021-10-25 | House | Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on House Steering, Policy and Scheduling |
2021-10-08 | Joint | Hearing scheduled for 10/19/2021 from 11:00 AM-03:00 PM in Virtual Hearing |
2021-10-06 | Senate | Senate concurred |
2021-10-04 | House | Referred to the Joint Committee on Municipalities and Regional Government |
Same As/Similar To
H3794 (Similar To) 2022-12-22 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 317 of the Acts of 2022
H3986 (Similar To) 2022-02-09 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 21 of the Acts of 2022
H5300 (Similar To) 2023-01-03 - No further action taken
H5301 (Similar To) 2023-01-03 - No further action taken
H5299 (Similar To) 2023-01-03 - No further action taken
H3986 (Similar To) 2022-02-09 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 21 of the Acts of 2022
H5300 (Similar To) 2023-01-03 - No further action taken
H5301 (Similar To) 2023-01-03 - No further action taken
H5299 (Similar To) 2023-01-03 - No further action taken
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/192/H4192 |
Text | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/192/H4192.pdf |