MA H4188 | 2013-2014 | 188th General Court
Note: Replaces legislation H4078
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on August 13 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-08-13 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 285 of the Acts of 2014
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on August 13 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-08-13 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 285 of the Acts of 2014
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Increasing the exemption for residential real property from 30 per cent to 35 per cent in the city of Somerville
Title
Increasing the exemption for residential real property from 30 per cent to 35 per cent in the city of Somerville
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-08-13 | Signed by the Governor, Chapter 285 of the Acts of 2014 | |
2014-08-11 | Senate | Enacted and laid before the Governor |
2014-08-04 | Senate | Read third (title changed) and passed to be engrossed |
2014-08-04 | Senate | Taken out of the Orders of the Day |
2014-07-24 | Senate | Read second and ordered to a third reading |
2014-07-22 | Senate | Read and placed in the Orders of the Day for the next session |
2014-07-21 | House | Read third (title changed) and passed to be engrossed |
2014-06-30 | House | Read second and ordered to a third reading |
2014-06-26 | House | Committee reported that the matter be placed in the Orders of the Day for the next sitting for a second reading |
2014-06-18 | House | Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on House Steering, Policy and Scheduling |
2014-06-18 | House | New draft of H4078 |
2014-06-18 | House | Reported from the committee on Revenue |
Same As/Similar To
H4078 (Replaces) 2014-06-18 - Accompanied a new draft, see H4188
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/188/House/H4188 |
Text | http://www.malegislature.gov/Document/Bill/188/House/H4188.pdf |