MA H417 | 2019-2020 | 191st General Court
Note: Legislation replaced by H4428
Status
Spectrum: Strong Partisan Bill (Democrat 19-1)
Status: Introduced on January 22 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-02-20 - Accompanied a new draft, see H4428
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 22 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-02-20 - Accompanied a new draft, see H4428
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Relative to the certification of interpreters in educational settings. Education.
Title
Relative to the certification of interpreters in educational settings
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-02-20 | House | Accompanied a new draft, see H4428 |
2019-08-26 | Joint | Hearing scheduled for 09/04/2019 from 11:00 AM-05:00 PM in A-1 |
2019-01-22 | Senate | Senate concurred |
2019-01-22 | House | Referred to the Joint Committee on Education |
Same As/Similar To
H3237 (Similar To) 2020-06-22 - Reporting date extended to Thursday December 31, 2020, pending concurrence
H194 (Similar To) 2020-10-26 - Accompanied a study order, see H5043
H546 (Similar To) 2019-11-12 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on House Ways and Means
S1440 (Similar To) 2020-05-21 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
H1744 (Similar To) 2020-03-09 - Accompanied a new draft, see H4537
S1382 (Similar To) 2019-11-25 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
S198 (Similar To) 2020-02-13 - Accompanied a study order, see S2534
H4428 (Replaced by) 2020-02-20 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on House Ways and Means
H194 (Similar To) 2020-10-26 - Accompanied a study order, see H5043
H546 (Similar To) 2019-11-12 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on House Ways and Means
S1440 (Similar To) 2020-05-21 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
H1744 (Similar To) 2020-03-09 - Accompanied a new draft, see H4537
S1382 (Similar To) 2019-11-25 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
S198 (Similar To) 2020-02-13 - Accompanied a study order, see S2534
H4428 (Replaced by) 2020-02-20 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on House Ways and Means
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/191/H417 |
Text | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/191/H417.pdf |