MA H4169 | 2013-2014 | 188th General Court
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on August 21 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-08-21 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 298 of the Acts of 2014
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on August 21 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-08-21 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 298 of the Acts of 2014
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Relative to increasing the number of members on the board of selectmen in the town of Sherborn. Municipalities and Regional Government. [Local Approval Received.]
Title
Increasing the number of selectmen in the town of Sherborn
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-08-21 | Signed by the Governor, Chapter 298 of the Acts of 2014 | |
2014-08-18 | Senate | Enacted and laid before the Governor |
2014-08-14 | House | Enacted |
2014-08-11 | Senate | Read third and passed to be engrossed |
2014-08-11 | Senate | Taken out of the Orders of the Day |
2014-07-16 | Senate | Read second and ordered to a third reading |
2014-07-11 | Senate | Read and placed in the Orders of the Day for the next session |
2014-07-10 | House | Read third (title changed) and passed to be engrossed |
2014-06-30 | House | Read second and ordered to a third reading |
2014-06-26 | House | Committee reported that the matter be placed in the Orders of the Day for the next sitting for a second reading |
2014-06-23 | House | Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on House Steering, Policy and Scheduling |
2014-06-13 | Joint | Hearing scheduled for 06/19/2014 from 10:30 AM-11:30 AM in A-2 |
2014-06-12 | Senate | Senate concurred |
2014-06-10 | House | Referred to the House Committee on Municipalities and Regional Government |
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/188/House/H4169 |
Text | http://www.malegislature.gov/Document/Bill/188/House/H4169.pdf |