MA H4169 | 2009-2010 | 186th General Court
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on June 23 2010 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2010-06-24 - Read; and referred to the Senate Committee on Ethics and Rules
Pending: Senate Ethics and Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on June 23 2010 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2010-06-24 - Read; and referred to the Senate Committee on Ethics and Rules
Pending: Senate Ethics and Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
CLARIFYING THE CONTINUING EDUCATION REQUIREMENTS FOR REAL ESTATE BROKERS AND SALES PERSONS
Title
CLARIFYING THE CONTINUING EDUCATION REQUIREMENTS FOR REAL ESTATE BROKERS AND SALES PERSONS
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-06-24 | Read; and referred to the Senate Committee on Ethics and Rules | |
2010-06-23 | Read third (title changed) and passed to be engrossed | |
2009-11-10 | Read second and ordered to a third reading | |
2009-09-16 | Committee reported that the matter be placed in the Orders of the Day for the next sitting for a second reading |
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://www.mass.gov/legis/186history/h04169.htm |
Text | http://www.mass.gov/legis/bills/house/186/ht04/ht04169.htm |