MA H4164 | 2013-2014 | 188th General Court
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Unknown
Status: Passed on June 26 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-06-26 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 149 of the Acts of 2014
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Unknown
Status: Passed on June 26 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-06-26 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 149 of the Acts of 2014
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Relative to natural gas leaks
Title
Relative to natural gas leaks
Sponsors
No sponsor information available at this time. |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-06-26 | Signed by the Governor, Chapter 149 of the Acts of 2014 | |
2014-06-19 | Senate | Enacted and laid before the Governor |
2014-06-16 | House | Enacted |
2014-06-12 | Senate | Committee of conference report accepted, in concurrence -see Roll Call #349 [Yeas 38 to Nays 0] |
2014-06-12 | Senate | Rules suspended |
2014-06-11 | House | Committee of conference report accepted 147 YEAS to 0 NAYS (See YEA and NAY in Supplement, No. 384) |
2014-06-11 | House | Rules suspended |
2014-06-10 | House | Committee reported that the matter be placed in the Orders of the Day for the next sitting, the question being on acceptance |
2014-06-09 | House | Referred to the committee on House Steering, Policy and Scheduling |
2014-06-09 | House | Reported by committee of conference, see H3873 |
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/188/House/H4164 |
Text | http://www.malegislature.gov/Document/Bill/188/House/H4164.pdf |