MA H4156 | 2011-2012 | 187th General Court
Note: Replaces legislation H3966
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on July 25 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-07-25 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 160 of the Acts of 2012
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on July 25 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-07-25 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 160 of the Acts of 2012
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
The committee on Transportation, reports, on House, No. 3966, a Bill designating a certain overpass in the town of Yarmouth as the Marine Corporal Nicholas G. Xiarhos Veterans Memorial Overpass (House, No. 4156). June 6, 2012. William M. Straus, for the committee.
Title
Designating a certain overpass in the town of Yarmouth as the Marine Corporal Nicholas G. Xiarhos Veterans Memorial Overpass
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-07-25 | Senate | Signed by the Governor, Chapter 160 of the Acts of 2012 |
2012-07-19 | Senate | Enacted and laid before the Governor |
2012-07-19 | House | Enacted |
2012-07-19 | Senate | Read second, ordered to a third reading, read third and passed to be engrossed |
2012-07-19 | Senate | Taken out of the Orders of the Day |
2012-07-18 | Senate | Committee reported that the matter be placed in the Orders of the Day for the next session |
2012-07-12 | Senate | Read and referred to the committee on Senate Ethics and Rules |
2012-06-28 | House | Read third and passed to be engrossed |
2012-06-14 | House | Read second and ordered to a third reading |
2012-06-14 | House | Rules suspended |
2012-06-14 | House | Committee reported that the matter be placed in the Orders of the Day for the next sitting |
2012-06-07 | House | Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the House committee on Steering, Policy and Scheduling |
2012-06-07 | House | New draft of H3966 |
2012-06-07 | House | Reported from the committee on Transportation |
Same As/Similar To
H3966 (Replaces) 2012-06-07 - Accompanied a new draft, see H4156
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://www.malegislature.gov/Bills/187/House/H4156 |
Text | http://www.malegislature.gov/Bills/PDF?billId=117732&generalCourtId=1 |