MA H4152 | 2021-2022 | 192nd General Court
Note: Legislation replaced by H4844
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on September 30 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-06-09 - Accompanied a study order, see H4844
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on September 30 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-06-09 - Accompanied a study order, see H4844
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Relative to providing for protections in the processing of personal data and the free movement of personal data. The Judiciary.
Title
Establishing an internet bill of rights
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-06-09 | House | Accompanied a study order, see H4844 |
2021-11-16 | Joint | Hearing scheduled for 11/23/2021 from 10:00 AM-02:00 PM in Virtual Hearing |
2021-09-30 | Senate | Senate concurred |
2021-09-30 | House | Referred to the Joint Committee on The Judiciary |
Same As/Similar To
H104 (Similar To) 2022-08-29 - Accompanied a study order, see H5040
S1616 (Similar To) 2022-03-17 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
S87 (Similar To) 2022-06-30 - New draft substituted, see S2954
H139 (Similar To) 2022-08-29 - Accompanied a study order, see H5040
S2146 (Similar To) 2022-02-24 - Accompanied a study order, see S2715
H120 (Similar To) 2022-08-29 - Accompanied a study order, see H5040
S45 (Similar To) 2022-02-10 - Accompanied a study order, see S2683
S960 (Similar To) 2022-02-07 - Accompanied a study order, see S2665
H4844 (Replaced by) 2022-06-09 - Discharged to the committee on House Rules
S236 (Similar To) 2022-02-17 - Accompanied a study order, see S2701
H2958 (Similar To) 2022-09-08 - Accompanied a study order, see H5200
H204 (Similar To) 2021-11-02 - Accompanied H212
S1616 (Similar To) 2022-03-17 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
S87 (Similar To) 2022-06-30 - New draft substituted, see S2954
H139 (Similar To) 2022-08-29 - Accompanied a study order, see H5040
S2146 (Similar To) 2022-02-24 - Accompanied a study order, see S2715
H120 (Similar To) 2022-08-29 - Accompanied a study order, see H5040
S45 (Similar To) 2022-02-10 - Accompanied a study order, see S2683
S960 (Similar To) 2022-02-07 - Accompanied a study order, see S2665
H4844 (Replaced by) 2022-06-09 - Discharged to the committee on House Rules
S236 (Similar To) 2022-02-17 - Accompanied a study order, see S2701
H2958 (Similar To) 2022-09-08 - Accompanied a study order, see H5200
H204 (Similar To) 2021-11-02 - Accompanied H212
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/192/H4152 |
Text | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/192/H4152.pdf |