MA H414 | 2021-2022 | 192nd General Court
Note: Legislation replaced by H4935
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Introduced on March 29 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-09-29 - Accompanied a study order, see H4935
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on March 29 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-09-29 - Accompanied a study order, see H4935
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Relative to certain licenses for the sale of alcoholic beverages. Consumer Protection and Professional Licensure.
Title
Further regulating certain licenses for the sale of alcoholic beverages
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-09-29 | House | Accompanied a study order, see H4935 |
2022-03-07 | Senate | Senate concurred |
2022-02-03 | House | Reporting date extended to Tuesday May 10, 2022, pending concurrence |
2022-01-03 | Joint | Hearing scheduled for 01/10/2022 from 01:00 PM-03:00 PM in Virtual Hearing |
2022-01-03 | Joint | Hearing canceled – new hearing TBD |
2022-01-03 | Joint | Hearing scheduled for 01/10/2022 from 01:00 PM-03:00 PM in Virtual Hearing |
2021-03-29 | Senate | Senate concurred |
2021-03-29 | House | Referred to the Joint Committee on Consumer Protection and Professional Licensure |
Same As/Similar To
H3861 (Similar To) 2021-09-20 - Accompanied a new draft, see H4115
H3890 (Similar To) 2021-09-20 - Accompanied a new draft, see H4116
H3831 (Similar To) 2021-11-08 - Accompanied a new draft, see H4240
H3712 (Similar To) 2022-01-21 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 7 of the Acts of 2022
H380 (Similar To) 2021-05-27 - Accompanied a new draft, see H3811
H3907 (Similar To) 2023-01-03 - No further action taken
H3933 (Similar To) 2022-04-11 - Accompanied a new draft, see H4663
H4065 (Similar To) 2023-01-03 - No further action taken
H4086 (Similar To) 2022-04-11 - Accompanied a new draft, see H4664
H4132 (Similar To) 2023-01-03 - No further action taken
H4129 (Similar To) 2023-01-03 - No further action taken
H1404 (Similar To) 2022-09-01 - Accompanied a study order, see H5204
H3715 (Similar To) 2021-05-27 - Accompanied a new draft, see H3813
S199 (Similar To) 2022-02-07 - Accompanied a study order, see S2666
H1733 (Similar To) 2022-06-09 - Accompanied a study order, see H4844
S171 (Similar To) 2022-02-10 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
S66 (Similar To) 2022-02-07 - Accompanied a study order, see S2661
S1553 (Similar To) 2022-03-17 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
S798 (Similar To) 2022-06-09 - Accompanied a study order, see S2917
H4935 (Replaced by) 2023-01-03 - No further action taken
H518 (Similar To) 2021-07-19 - Accompanied a new draft, see H3974
H359 (Similar To) 2022-06-30 - Accompanied a study order, see H4880
H3890 (Similar To) 2021-09-20 - Accompanied a new draft, see H4116
H3831 (Similar To) 2021-11-08 - Accompanied a new draft, see H4240
H3712 (Similar To) 2022-01-21 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 7 of the Acts of 2022
H380 (Similar To) 2021-05-27 - Accompanied a new draft, see H3811
H3907 (Similar To) 2023-01-03 - No further action taken
H3933 (Similar To) 2022-04-11 - Accompanied a new draft, see H4663
H4065 (Similar To) 2023-01-03 - No further action taken
H4086 (Similar To) 2022-04-11 - Accompanied a new draft, see H4664
H4132 (Similar To) 2023-01-03 - No further action taken
H4129 (Similar To) 2023-01-03 - No further action taken
H1404 (Similar To) 2022-09-01 - Accompanied a study order, see H5204
H3715 (Similar To) 2021-05-27 - Accompanied a new draft, see H3813
S199 (Similar To) 2022-02-07 - Accompanied a study order, see S2666
H1733 (Similar To) 2022-06-09 - Accompanied a study order, see H4844
S171 (Similar To) 2022-02-10 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
S66 (Similar To) 2022-02-07 - Accompanied a study order, see S2661
S1553 (Similar To) 2022-03-17 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
S798 (Similar To) 2022-06-09 - Accompanied a study order, see S2917
H4935 (Replaced by) 2023-01-03 - No further action taken
H518 (Similar To) 2021-07-19 - Accompanied a new draft, see H3974
H359 (Similar To) 2022-06-30 - Accompanied a study order, see H4880
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/192/H414 |
Text | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/192/H414.pdf |