MA H4134 | 2019-2020 | 191st General Court

Status

Spectrum: Unknown
Status: Introduced on October 24 2019 - 25% progression
Action: 2020-06-22 - Reporting date extended to Thursday December 31, 2020, pending concurrence
Pending: Joint Health Care Financing Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

To improve health care by investing in VALUE

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

To improve health care by investing in VALUE

Sponsors

No sponsor information available at this time.

History

DateChamberAction
2020-06-22HouseReporting date extended to Thursday December 31, 2020, pending concurrence
2020-04-30SenateSenate concurred
2020-04-29HouseReporting date extended to Friday June 19, 2020, pending concurrence
2020-03-26SenateSenate concurred
2020-03-23HouseReporting date extended to Friday May 1, 2020, pending concurrence
2020-01-17JointHearing scheduled for 01/28/2020 from 11:00 AM-04:00 PM in A-1 & A-2
2019-10-28SenateSenate concurred
2019-10-24HouseReferred to the Joint Committee on Health Care Financing

Same As/Similar To

H1914 (Similar To) 2020-06-22 - Reporting date extended to Thursday December 31, 2020, pending concurrence
S561 (Similar To) 2020-07-23 - Ought NOT to pass (under Joint Rule 10) and placed in the Orders of the Day for the next session
S687 (Similar To) 2020-07-23 - Ought NOT to pass (under Joint Rule 10) and placed in the Orders of the Day for the next session
S729 (Similar To) 2020-07-23 - Ought NOT to pass (under Joint Rule 10) and placed in the Orders of the Day for the next session
S543 (Similar To) 2020-02-18 - Accompanied a study order, see S2543
S2447 (Similar To) 2019-12-30 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means

Massachusetts State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback