MA H4128 | 2017-2018 | 190th General Court
Note: Replaces legislation H227
Status
Spectrum: Unknown
Status: Introduced on January 22 2018 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-01-01 - No further action taken
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 22 2018 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-01-01 - No further action taken
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Promoting local control and effective training of school resource officers
Title
Promoting local control and effective training of school resource officers
Sponsors
No sponsor information available at this time. |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-01-01 | House | No further action taken |
2018-01-22 | House | Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on House Ways and Means |
2018-01-22 | House | New draft of H227, H328 and H2021 |
2018-01-22 | House | Reported from the committee on Education |
Same As/Similar To
H227 (Replaces) 2018-01-22 - Accompanied a new draft, see H4128
S2109 (Similar To) 2017-10-26 - New draft substituted, see S2192
H136 (Similar To) 2018-07-02 - Accompanied a study order, see H4638
H1168 (Similar To) 2017-05-30 - Accompanied a new draft, see H3719
S1371 (Similar To) 2018-01-26 - Accompanied S1328
H2400 (Similar To) 2018-05-24 - Accompanied a study order, see H4528
S2257 (Similar To) 2018-01-25 - Referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
S2297 (Similar To) 2019-01-01 - No further action taken
H4321 (Similar To) 2018-04-30 - Accompanied a new draft, see H4438
H1456 (Similar To) 2018-06-25 - Accompanied a study order, see H4654
S2109 (Similar To) 2017-10-26 - New draft substituted, see S2192
H136 (Similar To) 2018-07-02 - Accompanied a study order, see H4638
H1168 (Similar To) 2017-05-30 - Accompanied a new draft, see H3719
S1371 (Similar To) 2018-01-26 - Accompanied S1328
H2400 (Similar To) 2018-05-24 - Accompanied a study order, see H4528
S2257 (Similar To) 2018-01-25 - Referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
S2297 (Similar To) 2019-01-01 - No further action taken
H4321 (Similar To) 2018-04-30 - Accompanied a new draft, see H4438
H1456 (Similar To) 2018-06-25 - Accompanied a study order, see H4654
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/190/H4128 |
Text | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/190/H4128.pdf |