MA H4109 | 2013-2014 | 188th General Court
Note: Replaces legislation H3868
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on September 3 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-09-03 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 307 of the Acts of 2014
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on September 3 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-09-03 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 307 of the Acts of 2014
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Relative to defense policies of the Commonwealth
Title
Relative to defense policies of the Commonwealth
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-09-03 | Signed by the Governor, Chapter 307 of the Acts of 2014 | |
2014-08-25 | Senate | Enacted and laid before the Governor |
2014-08-21 | House | Enacted |
2014-08-18 | House | House concurred in the Senate amendment |
2014-07-31 | House | Referred to the committee on House Bills in the Third Reading |
2014-07-30 | Senate | Read third and passed to be engrossed |
2014-07-30 | Senate | Ordered to a third reading |
2014-07-30 | Senate | Amended by striking out all after the enacting clause and inserting in place thereof the text of S2327 |
2014-07-30 | Senate | Read second |
2014-07-30 | Senate | Rules suspended |
2014-07-30 | Senate | Committee recommended ought to pass with an amendment, inserting in place thereof the text of S2327 |
2014-07-11 | Senate | Read; and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means |
2014-07-10 | House | Read third (title changed) and passed to be engrossed |
2014-05-27 | House | Ordered to a third reading |
2014-05-27 | House | New draft of H3868 |
2014-05-27 | House | Pending new draft of H3868 |
2014-05-27 | House | Reported from the committee on House Ways and Means |
Same As/Similar To
H3868 (Replaces) 2014-05-27 - Amendment adopted (as recommended by the committee on House Ways and Means), see H4109
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/188/House/H4109 |
Text | http://www.malegislature.gov/Document/Bill/188/House/H4109.pdf |