MA H41 | 2019-2020 | 191st General Court
Note: Legislation replaced by S2348
Status
Spectrum: Unknown
Status: Introduced on January 22 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-09-19 - Accompanied a new draft, see S2348
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 22 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-09-19 - Accompanied a new draft, see S2348
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
So much of the recommendations of the Department of the State Treasurer (House, No. 27) as relates to investing in the Commonwealth’s schools. Education.
Title
Investing in the Commonwealth’s schools
Sponsors
No sponsor information available at this time. |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-09-19 | Senate | Accompanied a new draft, see S2348 |
2019-07-03 | Joint | Hearing scheduled for 07/16/2019 from 01:00 PM-05:00 PM in 222 |
2019-01-22 | Senate | Senate concurred |
2019-01-22 | House | Referred to the Joint Committee on Education |
Same As/Similar To
H50 (Similar To) 2019-12-06 - Committee recommended ought to pass with an amendment and referred to the committee on House Ways and Means with the amendment pending
H38 (Similar To) 2020-01-21 - Accompanied H202
H557 (Similar To) 2020-12-03 - Accompanied a study order, see H5159
H524 (Similar To) 2020-12-03 - Accompanied a study order, see H5159
H437 (Similar To) 2020-02-20 - Accompanied a new draft, see H4426
H405 (Similar To) 2020-12-03 - Accompanied a study order, see H5159
H1377 (Similar To) 2020-11-12 - Accompanied a study order, see H5081
S731 (Similar To) 2020-02-18 - Accompanied a study order, see S2538
S272 (Similar To) 2020-02-18 - Accompanied a study order, see S2538
S261 (Similar To) 2020-02-18 - Accompanied a study order, see S2538
S1113 (Similar To) 2020-05-21 - Accompanied a new draft, see S2711
S306 (Similar To) 2020-02-18 - Accompanied a study order, see S2538
S307 (Similar To) 2020-02-18 - Accompanied a study order, see S2538
S1582 (Similar To) 2020-02-18 - Accompanied a study order, see S2545
H421 (Similar To) 2020-12-03 - Accompanied a study order, see H5159
S330 (Similar To) 2020-02-18 - Accompanied a study order, see S2538
S253 (Similar To) 2019-11-14 - Resolve reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
H3853 (Similar To) 2020-12-03 - Accompanied a study order, see H5159
S2324 (Similar To) 2020-03-05 - Accompanied a new draft, see S2581
S2348 (Replaced by) 2019-10-03 - New draft substituted, see S2350
S2398 (Similar To) 2019-11-14 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
H38 (Similar To) 2020-01-21 - Accompanied H202
H557 (Similar To) 2020-12-03 - Accompanied a study order, see H5159
H524 (Similar To) 2020-12-03 - Accompanied a study order, see H5159
H437 (Similar To) 2020-02-20 - Accompanied a new draft, see H4426
H405 (Similar To) 2020-12-03 - Accompanied a study order, see H5159
H1377 (Similar To) 2020-11-12 - Accompanied a study order, see H5081
S731 (Similar To) 2020-02-18 - Accompanied a study order, see S2538
S272 (Similar To) 2020-02-18 - Accompanied a study order, see S2538
S261 (Similar To) 2020-02-18 - Accompanied a study order, see S2538
S1113 (Similar To) 2020-05-21 - Accompanied a new draft, see S2711
S306 (Similar To) 2020-02-18 - Accompanied a study order, see S2538
S307 (Similar To) 2020-02-18 - Accompanied a study order, see S2538
S1582 (Similar To) 2020-02-18 - Accompanied a study order, see S2545
H421 (Similar To) 2020-12-03 - Accompanied a study order, see H5159
S330 (Similar To) 2020-02-18 - Accompanied a study order, see S2538
S253 (Similar To) 2019-11-14 - Resolve reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
H3853 (Similar To) 2020-12-03 - Accompanied a study order, see H5159
S2324 (Similar To) 2020-03-05 - Accompanied a new draft, see S2581
S2348 (Replaced by) 2019-10-03 - New draft substituted, see S2350
S2398 (Similar To) 2019-11-14 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/191/H41 |
Text | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/191/H41.pdf |