MA H4096 | 2021-2022 | 192nd General Court
Note: Replaces legislation H3611
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on September 2 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2023-01-03 - No further action taken
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on September 2 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2023-01-03 - No further action taken
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Regarding audit performance and functions at the Department of Transportation
Title
Regarding audit performance and functions at the Department of Transportation
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-01-03 | House | No further action taken |
2021-09-02 | House | Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on House Ways and Means |
2021-09-02 | House | New draft of H3611 |
2021-09-02 | House | Reported from the committee on Transportation |
Same As/Similar To
H3611 (Replaces) 2021-09-02 - Accompanied a new draft, see H4096
H2582 (Similar To) 2022-07-05 - Accompanied a study order, see H4960
S2090 (Similar To) 2022-02-22 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
S2309 (Similar To) 2022-04-04 - Accompanied a new draft, see S2809
S2538 (Similar To) 2022-03-14 - Accompanied a study order, see S2758
S2366 (Similar To) 2022-01-24 - Accompanied a study order, see S2621
S2257 (Similar To) 2022-02-03 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
H3463 (Similar To) 2022-09-08 - Accompanied a study order, see H4966
S1545 (Similar To) 2022-03-17 - Accompanied a study order, see S2768
S1772 (Similar To) 2022-03-31 - Accompanied a new draft, see H4619
S2347 (Similar To) 2022-02-22 - Accompanied a study order, see S2712
H2582 (Similar To) 2022-07-05 - Accompanied a study order, see H4960
S2090 (Similar To) 2022-02-22 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
S2309 (Similar To) 2022-04-04 - Accompanied a new draft, see S2809
S2538 (Similar To) 2022-03-14 - Accompanied a study order, see S2758
S2366 (Similar To) 2022-01-24 - Accompanied a study order, see S2621
S2257 (Similar To) 2022-02-03 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
H3463 (Similar To) 2022-09-08 - Accompanied a study order, see H4966
S1545 (Similar To) 2022-03-17 - Accompanied a study order, see S2768
S1772 (Similar To) 2022-03-31 - Accompanied a new draft, see H4619
S2347 (Similar To) 2022-02-22 - Accompanied a study order, see S2712
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/192/H4096 |
Text | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/192/H4096.pdf |