MA H4094 | 2023-2024 | 193rd General Court
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Introduced on June 5 2023 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-04-22 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on House Ways and Means
Pending: House Ways and Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on June 5 2023 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-04-22 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on House Ways and Means
Pending: House Ways and Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
For legislation to authorize the establishment of the Manuel F. Correllus State Forest trust fund. Environment and Natural Resources.
Title
Creating the Manuel F. Correllus State Forest Trust Fund
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-04-22 | House | Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on House Ways and Means |
2024-03-18 | Senate | Senate concurred |
2024-02-08 | House | Reporting date extended to Friday April 12, 2024, pending concurrence |
2023-09-28 | Joint | Hearing scheduled for 10/11/2023 from 01:00 PM-05:00 PM in A-1 |
2023-09-14 | Senate | Senate concurred |
2023-09-11 | House | Reported, referred to the committee on Joint Rules, reported, rules suspended and referred to the Joint Committee on Environment and Natural Resources |
2023-06-05 | House | Referred to the committee on House Rules |
Same As/Similar To
S2409 (Similar To) 2023-06-29 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
S2496 (Similar To) 2024-02-15 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
S2521 (Similar To) 2024-02-08 - Accompanied a study order, see S2612
S2724 (Similar To) 2024-04-11 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
S2744 (Similar To) 2024-04-25 - Referred to the Joint Committee on Municipalities and Regional Government
S2496 (Similar To) 2024-02-15 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
S2521 (Similar To) 2024-02-08 - Accompanied a study order, see S2612
S2724 (Similar To) 2024-04-11 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
S2744 (Similar To) 2024-04-25 - Referred to the Joint Committee on Municipalities and Regional Government
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/193/H4094 |
Text | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/193/H4094.pdf |