MA S2521 | 2023-2024 | 193rd General Court
Note: Legislation replaced by S2612
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Introduced on October 2 2023 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-02-08 - Accompanied a study order, see S2612
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on October 2 2023 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-02-08 - Accompanied a study order, see S2612
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
For legislation to establish the Environmental Justice Trust Fund. The Judiciary.
Title
Establishing the Environmental Justice Trust Fund
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-02-08 | Senate | Accompanied a study order, see S2612 |
2023-11-28 | Joint | Hearing scheduled for 12/05/2023 from 01:00 PM-05:00 PM in A-2 |
2023-11-20 | House | House concurred |
2023-10-26 | Senate | Referred to the Joint Committee on The Judiciary |
2023-10-26 | Senate | Rules suspended |
2023-10-02 | Senate | Referred to the Joint Committee on Rules of the two branches, acting concurrently |
Same As/Similar To
S2381 (Similar To) 2024-02-20 - Accompanied a new draft, see S2601
S2612 (Replaced by) 2024-04-01 - Reported (in part) S2538
S2601 (Similar To) 2024-02-20 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
S2612 (Replaced by) 2024-04-01 - Reported (in part) S2538
S2601 (Similar To) 2024-02-20 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/193/S2521 |
Text | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/193/S2521.pdf |