MA H4082 | 2013-2014 | 188th General Court
Note: Replaces legislation S846
Note: Legislation replaced by H4495
Note: Legislation replaced by H4495
Status
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Introduced on May 15 2014 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2014-09-29 - Accompanied a study order, see H4495
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on May 15 2014 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2014-09-29 - Accompanied a study order, see H4495
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Relative to non-competition agreements
Title
Relative to non-competition agreements
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-09-29 | House | Accompanied a study order, see H4495 |
2014-06-24 | Joint | Hearing scheduled for 07/01/2014 from 11:00 AM-02:00 PM in B-1 |
2014-06-23 | Senate | Senate concurred |
2014-06-09 | House | Discharged to the House Committee on Economic Development and Emerging Technologies |
2014-05-15 | House | Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on House Steering, Policy and Scheduling |
2014-05-15 | House | New draft of S846, H1715 and H1729 |
2014-05-15 | House | Reported from the committee on Labor and Workforce Development |
Same As/Similar To
S846 (Replaces) 2014-05-15 - Accompanied a new draft, see H4082
H4495 (Replaced by) 2014-09-29 - Discharged to the committee on House Rules
H4495 (Replaced by) 2014-09-29 - Discharged to the committee on House Rules
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/188/House/H4082 |
Text | http://www.malegislature.gov/Document/Bill/188/House/H4082.pdf |