MA H4033 | 2015-2016 | 189th General Court
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 16 2016 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2016-03-31 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on House Ways and Means
Pending: House Ways and Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 16 2016 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2016-03-31 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on House Ways and Means
Pending: House Ways and Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
For legislation to authorize the Department of Elementary and Secondary Education to establish a grant program to support the development and expansion of high quality, comprehensive summer learning opportunities for students in districts with high concentrations of low income students. Education.
Title
To increase access to high quality summer learning opportunities
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-03-31 | House | Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on House Ways and Means |
2016-03-01 | Joint | Hearing scheduled for 03/07/2016 from 10:00 AM-05:00 PM in Gardner Auditorium |
2016-02-25 | Senate | Senate concurred |
2016-02-22 | House | Reported, referred to the committee on Joint Rules, reported, rules suspended and referred to the Joint Committee on Education |
2016-02-16 | House | Referred to the committee on House Rules |
Same As/Similar To
H460 (Similar To) 2016-04-06 - Accompanied a new draft, see H4141
H453 (Similar To) 2015-07-23 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on House Ways and Means
H454 (Similar To) 2016-02-18 - Accompanied a new draft, see H4011
H458 (Similar To) 2015-07-23 - Accompanied S250
H452 (Similar To) 2016-02-18 - Accompanied a new draft, see H4011
H4749 (Similar To) 2017-01-12 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 413 of the Acts of 2016
H453 (Similar To) 2015-07-23 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on House Ways and Means
H454 (Similar To) 2016-02-18 - Accompanied a new draft, see H4011
H458 (Similar To) 2015-07-23 - Accompanied S250
H452 (Similar To) 2016-02-18 - Accompanied a new draft, see H4011
H4749 (Similar To) 2017-01-12 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 413 of the Acts of 2016
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/189/H4033 |
Text | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/189/H4033.pdf |