MA H4016 | 2023-2024 | 193rd General Court

Note: Legislation replaced by H4720

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on July 26 2023 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-06-12 - Accompanied a study order, see H4720
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

For legislation to provide preferential tax rates to certain public benefit corporations. Revenue.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Relative to public benefit corporations

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2024-06-12HouseAccompanied a study order, see H4720
2023-11-08JointHearing scheduled for 11/14/2023 from 11:00 AM-01:00 PM in B-1
2023-07-27SenateSenate concurred
2023-07-26HouseReferred to the Joint Committee on Revenue

Same As/Similar To

S1796 (Similar To) 2024-06-13 - Accompanied a study order, see H4721
S1835 (Similar To) 2024-06-12 - Accompanied a study order, see H4720
H4524 (Similar To) 2024-07-11 - Senate concurred
H4478 (Similar To) 2024-05-30 - New draft substituted, see H4697
H4697 (Similar To) 2024-06-03 - Read; and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
H4720 (Replaced by) 2024-06-12 - Discharged to the committee on House Rules

Massachusetts State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback