MA S1835 | 2023-2024 | 193rd General Court

Note: Legislation replaced by H4720

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 17-0)
Status: Introduced on February 16 2023 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-06-12 - Accompanied a study order, see H4720
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

For legislation to establish a tiered corporate minimum tax. Revenue.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Establishing a tiered corporate minimum tax

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2024-06-12HouseAccompanied a study order, see H4720
2023-05-11JointHearing scheduled for 05/16/2023 from 01:00 PM-03:00 PM in A-1
2023-02-16HouseHouse concurred
2023-02-16SenateReferred to the Joint Committee on Revenue

Same As/Similar To

S1895 (Similar To) 2024-06-12 - Accompanied a study order, see H4720
S2754 (Similar To) 2024-05-02 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
H4603 (Similar To) 2024-05-02 - See H4251
S2807 (Similar To) 2024-06-06 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
H4720 (Replaced by) 2024-06-12 - Discharged to the committee on House Rules
S2835 (Similar To) 2024-06-24 - Hearing scheduled for 06/25/2024 from 09:00 AM-05:00 PM in Written Testimony Only

Massachusetts State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback