MA H3946 | 2013-2014 | 188th General Court
Note: Replaces legislation H3714
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on July 23 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-07-23 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 181 of the Acts of 2014
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on July 23 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-07-23 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 181 of the Acts of 2014
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Relative to proof of identity for certain licensure
Title
Relative to proof of identity for certain licensure
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-07-23 | Signed by the Governor, Chapter 181 of the Acts of 2014 | |
2014-07-16 | Senate | Enacted and laid before the Governor |
2014-07-16 | House | Enacted |
2014-07-14 | Senate | Emergency preamble adopted |
2014-07-14 | House | Emergency preamble adopted |
2014-07-10 | House | House concurred in the Senate amendment |
2014-07-10 | House | Bills in the Third reading special report accepted |
2014-06-25 | House | Referred to the House Committee on Bills in the Third Reading |
2014-06-23 | Senate | Read third and passed to be engrossed |
2014-06-23 | Senate | Ordered to a third reading |
2014-06-23 | Senate | Amended by striking out all after the enacting clause and inserting in place thereof the text of S2220 |
2014-06-23 | Senate | Read second |
2014-06-23 | Senate | Rules suspended |
2014-06-23 | Senate | Committee recommended ought to pass with an amendment, inserting in place thereof the text of S2220 |
2014-05-08 | Senate | Read; and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means |
2014-05-05 | House | Read third (title changed) and passed to be engrossed |
2014-04-03 | House | Read second and ordered to a third reading |
2014-03-25 | House | Committee reported that the matter be placed in the Orders of the Day for the next sitting for a second reading |
2014-03-12 | House | Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on House Steering, Policy and Scheduling |
2014-03-12 | House | New draft of H3714 |
2014-03-12 | House | Reported from the committee on State Administration and Regulatory Oversight |
Same As/Similar To
H3714 (Replaces) 2014-03-12 - Accompanied a new draft, see H3946
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/188/House/H3946 |
Text | http://www.malegislature.gov/Document/Bill/188/House/H3946.pdf |