MA H3936 | 2013-2014 | 188th General Court
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on July 18 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-07-18 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 171 of the Acts of 2014
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on July 18 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-07-18 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 171 of the Acts of 2014
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Bill Title: An Act establishing a district to operate a regional public safety communications and dispatch center for the city known as the city of Revere and the town of Winthrop By Mr. DeLeo of Winthrop, a petition (subject to Joint Rule 12) of Robert A. DeLeo (by vote of the town) that the town of Winthrop be authorized to enter into an agreement with the city of Revere to operate a regional public safety communications and dispatch center. Public Safety and Homeland Security. [Local Approval Received.]
Title
Establishing a district to operate a regional public safety communications and dispatch center for the city known as the city of Revere and the town of Winthrop
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-07-18 | Signed by the Governor, Chapter 171 of the Acts of 2014 | |
2014-07-10 | Senate | Enacted and laid before the Governor |
2014-07-08 | Senate | Read third (title changed) and passed to be engrossed |
2014-07-08 | Senate | Taken out of the Orders of the Day |
2014-06-26 | Senate | Read second and ordered to a third reading |
2014-06-12 | Senate | Read and placed in the Orders of the Day for the next session |
2014-06-09 | House | Read third and passed to be engrossed |
2014-06-05 | House | Read second and ordered to a third reading |
2014-06-05 | House | Rules suspended |
2014-06-05 | House | Committee reported that the matter be placed in the Orders of the Day for the next sitting |
2014-05-12 | House | Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on House Steering, Policy and Scheduling |
2014-03-31 | Joint | Hearing scheduled for 04/02/2014 from 12:00 PM-01:00 PM in B-1 |
2014-03-06 | Senate | Senate concurred |
2014-03-05 | House | Reported, referred to the committee on Joint Rules, reported, rules suspended and referred to the House Committee on Public Safety and Homeland Security |
2014-02-12 | House | Referred to the committee on House Rules |
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/188/House/H3936 |
Text | http://www.malegislature.gov/Document/Bill/188/House/H3936.pdf |