MA H3929 | 2021-2022 | 192nd General Court
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on July 6 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-07-07 - Adopted - 130 YEAS to 30 NAYS (See YEA and NAY No. 54 )
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on July 6 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-07-07 - Adopted - 130 YEAS to 30 NAYS (See YEA and NAY No. 54 )
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Relative to the extension of Emergency House Rules
Title
Order relative to the Extension of Emergency House Rules
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2021-07-07 - House - House Adopted - 130 YEAS to 30 NAYS (Y: 130 N: 30 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-07-07 | House | Adopted - 130 YEAS to 30 NAYS (See YEA and NAY No. 54 ) |
2021-07-06 | House | Postponed to Wednesday, July 7, 2021, at 1:00pm |
2021-07-06 | House | Committee recommended ought to be adopted |
2021-07-06 | House | Reported from the committee on House Rules |
Same As/Similar To
H3930 (Similar To) 2021-07-07 - Published as amended, see H3932
H3931 (Similar To) 2021-07-06 - Adopted
H3928 (Similar To) 2021-07-06 - Placed on file
H60 (Similar To) 2021-07-06 - For report, see H3928
S12 (Similar To) 2022-03-31 - Amendment #3 (Lovely) adopted
H3932 (Similar To) 2021-07-12 - Adopted - 129 YEAS to 29 NAYS (See YEA and NAY No. 64 )
H59 (Similar To) 2021-01-28 - Adopted
H63 (Similar To) 2021-02-12 - Adopted
H3931 (Similar To) 2021-07-06 - Adopted
H3928 (Similar To) 2021-07-06 - Placed on file
H60 (Similar To) 2021-07-06 - For report, see H3928
S12 (Similar To) 2022-03-31 - Amendment #3 (Lovely) adopted
H3932 (Similar To) 2021-07-12 - Adopted - 129 YEAS to 29 NAYS (See YEA and NAY No. 64 )
H59 (Similar To) 2021-01-28 - Adopted
H63 (Similar To) 2021-02-12 - Adopted
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/192/H3929 |
Text | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/192/H3929.pdf |
Roll Call | https://malegislature.gov/RollCall/192/HouseRollCall54.pdf |