MA H60 | 2021-2022 | 192nd General Court

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 28 2021 - 25% progression
Action: 2021-01-28 - Adopted
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

Relative to a study of the rules of the House. January 28, 2021.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

To a study of the rules of the House

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2021-01-28HouseAdopted
2021-01-28HouseCommittee recommended ought to be adopted
2021-01-28HouseReported from the temporary committee on House Rules

Same As/Similar To

H3140 (Similar To) 2021-12-30 - Resolve reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on House Ways and Means
S827 (Similar To) 2022-02-24 - Accompanied a study order, see S2714
S1431 (Similar To) 2022-02-14 - Accompanied a study order, see S2692
S1706 (Similar To) 2022-02-10 - Accompanied a study order, see S2679
H3614 (Similar To) 2022-01-11 - Hearing scheduled for 01/19/2022 from 03:00 PM-06:00 PM in Virtual Hearing
H3931 (Similar To) 2021-07-06 - Adopted
H3928 (Similar To) 2021-07-06 - Placed on file
S259 (Similar To) 2022-03-03 - Accompanied a new draft, see S2728
S2257 (Similar To) 2022-02-03 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
S1505 (Similar To) 2022-02-14 - Accompanied a study order, see S2692
S2091 (Similar To) 2022-01-24 - Accompanied a study order, see S2620
S2092 (Similar To) 2022-01-24 - Accompanied a study order, see S2620
S786 (Similar To) 2021-11-17 - Accompanied S771
S2343 (Similar To) 2022-01-24 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means

Massachusetts State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback