MA H3930 | 2021-2022 | 192nd General Court
Note: Legislation replaced by H3932
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on July 6 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-07-07 - Published as amended, see H3932
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on July 6 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-07-07 - Published as amended, see H3932
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Order (filed by Mr. Galvin of Canton) for the adoption of permanent House Rules for the 192nd General Court governing the 2021-2022 legislative sessions (House, No. 3930). July 6, 2021.
Title
Order (filed by Mr. Galvin of Canton) for the adoption of permanent House Rules for the 192nd General Court governing the 2021-2022 legislative sessions (House, No. 3930). July 6, 2021.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2021-07-07 - House - House Amendment 3 rejected - 39 YEAS to 119 NAYS (Y: 39 N: 119 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [FAIL]
2021-07-07 - House - House Amendment 16 rejected - 41 YEAS to 117 NAYS (Y: 41 N: 117 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [FAIL]
2021-07-07 - House - House Amendment 12 rejected - 38 YEAS to 121 NAYS (Y: 38 N: 121 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [FAIL]
2021-07-07 - House - House Adopted - 129 YEAS to 29 NAYS (Y: 129 N: 29 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2021-07-07 - House - House Amendment 9 rejected - 35 YEAS to 124 NAYS (Y: 35 N: 124 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [FAIL]
2021-07-07 - House - House Amendment 6 rejected - 30 YEAS to 129 NAYS (Y: 30 N: 129 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [FAIL]
2021-07-07 - House - House Amendment 2 rejected - 35 YEAS to 125 NAYS (Y: 35 N: 125 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2021-07-07 - House - House Amendment 13 rejected - 32 YEAS to 127 NAYS (Y: 32 N: 127 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [FAIL]
2021-07-07 - House - House Amendment 11 rejected - 33 YEAS to 126 NAYS (Y: 33 N: 126 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [FAIL]
2021-07-07 - House - House Amendment 1 adopted, as changed - 160 YEAS to 0 NAYS (Y: 160 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-07-07 - House - House Amendment 16 rejected - 41 YEAS to 117 NAYS (Y: 41 N: 117 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [FAIL]
2021-07-07 - House - House Amendment 12 rejected - 38 YEAS to 121 NAYS (Y: 38 N: 121 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [FAIL]
2021-07-07 - House - House Adopted - 129 YEAS to 29 NAYS (Y: 129 N: 29 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2021-07-07 - House - House Amendment 9 rejected - 35 YEAS to 124 NAYS (Y: 35 N: 124 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [FAIL]
2021-07-07 - House - House Amendment 6 rejected - 30 YEAS to 129 NAYS (Y: 30 N: 129 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [FAIL]
2021-07-07 - House - House Amendment 2 rejected - 35 YEAS to 125 NAYS (Y: 35 N: 125 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2021-07-07 - House - House Amendment 13 rejected - 32 YEAS to 127 NAYS (Y: 32 N: 127 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [FAIL]
2021-07-07 - House - House Amendment 11 rejected - 33 YEAS to 126 NAYS (Y: 33 N: 126 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [FAIL]
2021-07-07 - House - House Amendment 1 adopted, as changed - 160 YEAS to 0 NAYS (Y: 160 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-07-07 | House | Published as amended, see H3932 |
2021-07-07 | House | Amendment 18 adopted |
2021-07-07 | House | Amendment 4 adopted |
2021-07-07 | House | Laid aside on point of order |
2021-07-07 | House | Amendment 17 pending |
2021-07-07 | House | Amendment 3 rejected - 39 YEAS to 119 NAYS (See YEA and NAY No. 63 ) |
2021-07-07 | House | Amendment 16 rejected - 41 YEAS to 117 NAYS (See YEA and NAY No. 62 ) |
2021-07-07 | House | Amendment 12 rejected - 38 YEAS to 121 NAYS (See YEA and NAY No. 61 ) |
2021-07-07 | House | Amendment 15 rejected |
2021-07-07 | House | Amendment 14 rejected |
2021-07-07 | House | Amendment 13 rejected - 32 YEAS to 127 NAYS (See YEA and NAY No. 60 ) |
2021-07-07 | House | Amendment 11 rejected - 33 YEAS to 126 NAYS (See YEA and NAY No. 59 ) |
2021-07-07 | House | Amendment 10 rejected |
2021-07-07 | House | Amendment 9 rejected - 35 YEAS to 124 NAYS (See YEA and NAY No. 58 ) |
2021-07-07 | House | Amendment 7 rejected |
2021-07-07 | House | Amendment 6 rejected - 30 YEAS to 129 NAYS (See YEA and NAY No. 57 ) |
2021-07-07 | House | Amendment 5 rejected |
2021-07-07 | House | Amendment 2 rejected - 35 YEAS to 125 NAYS (See YEA and NAY No. 56 ) |
2021-07-07 | House | Amendment 1 adopted, as changed - 160 YEAS to 0 NAYS (See YEA and NAY No. 55 ) |
2021-07-06 | House | Postponed to Wednesday, July 7, 2021, at 1:00pm |
2021-07-06 | House | Committee recommended ought to be adopted |
2021-07-06 | House | Reported from the committee on House Rules |
Same As/Similar To
H3929 (Similar To) 2021-07-07 - Adopted - 130 YEAS to 30 NAYS (See YEA and NAY No. 54 )
H3931 (Similar To) 2021-07-06 - Adopted
H3928 (Similar To) 2021-07-06 - Placed on file
H60 (Similar To) 2021-07-06 - For report, see H3928
H59 (Similar To) 2021-01-28 - Adopted
H3932 (Replaced by) 2021-07-12 - Adopted - 129 YEAS to 29 NAYS (See YEA and NAY No. 64 )
H63 (Similar To) 2021-02-12 - Adopted
H3931 (Similar To) 2021-07-06 - Adopted
H3928 (Similar To) 2021-07-06 - Placed on file
H60 (Similar To) 2021-07-06 - For report, see H3928
H59 (Similar To) 2021-01-28 - Adopted
H3932 (Replaced by) 2021-07-12 - Adopted - 129 YEAS to 29 NAYS (See YEA and NAY No. 64 )
H63 (Similar To) 2021-02-12 - Adopted