MA H3909 | 2011-2012 | 187th General Court
Note: Replaces legislation H3668
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on July 27 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-07-27 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 163 of the Acts of 2012
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on July 27 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-07-27 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 163 of the Acts of 2012
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Relative authorizing the Division of Capital Asset Management and Maintenance to grant an easement in certain land in the town of Hopkinton (House, No. 3668) ought to pass with an amendment substituting therefor the accompanying bill (House, No. 3909). January 30, 2012.
Title
Authorizing the Division of Capital Asset Management and Maintenance to grant an easement in certain land in the town of Hopkinton
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-07-27 | Senate | Signed by the Governor, Chapter 163 of the Acts of 2012 |
2012-07-19 | Senate | Laid before the Governor |
2012-07-19 | Senate | Enacted (see Roll Call, No. 246 - Yeas 37 - Nays 0) |
2012-07-18 | House | Enacted - 153 YEAS to 0 NAYS (See YEA and NAY in Supplement, No. 316) |
2012-07-18 | Senate | Emergency preamble adopted |
2012-07-17 | House | Emergency preamble adopted |
2012-07-16 | Senate | Read second, ordered to a third reading, read third and passed to be engrossed |
2012-07-16 | Senate | Rules suspended |
2012-07-16 | Senate | Committee recommended ought to pass |
2012-04-12 | Senate | Read and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means |
2012-02-29 | House | Read third and passed to be engrossed |
2012-02-15 | House | Ordered to a third reading |
2012-02-15 | House | New draft of H3668 |
2012-01-30 | House | Recommended new draft for H3668 |
2012-01-30 | House | Reported from the committee on House Ways and Means |
Same As/Similar To
H3668 (Replaces) 2012-02-15 - New draft substituted, see H3909
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://www.malegislature.gov/Bills/187/House/H3909 |
Text | http://www.malegislature.gov/Bills/PDF?billId=17951&generalCourtId=1 |