MA H3870 | 2015-2016 | 189th General Court
Note: Replaces legislation S1128
Note: Legislation replaced by H3895
Note: Legislation replaced by H3895
Status
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Introduced on November 25 2015 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2015-12-17 - New draft substituted, see H3895
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on November 25 2015 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2015-12-17 - New draft substituted, see H3895
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
To increase access to immunizations
Title
To increase access to immunizations
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-12-17 | House | New draft substituted, see H3895 |
2015-12-17 | House | Read second, amended (as recommended by the committee on Health Care Financing) |
2015-12-17 | House | Rules suspended |
2015-12-17 | House | Committee reported that the matter be placed in the Orders of the Day for the next sitting with the amendment pending |
2015-12-14 | House | Referred to the committee on House Steering, Policy and Scheduling with the amendment pending |
2015-12-14 | House | Committee recommended bill ought to pass with an amendment, substituting therefore a bill with the same title, see H3895 |
2015-11-25 | House | Reported favorably by committee and referred to the Joint Committee on Health Care Financing |
2015-11-25 | House | New draft of S1128 and H2051 |
2015-11-25 | House | Reported from the committee on Public Health |
Same As/Similar To
S1128 (Replaces) 2015-11-25 - Accompanied a new draft, see H3870
H3895 (Replaced by) 2016-08-10 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 234 of the Acts of 2016
H3699 (Similar To) 2016-06-22 - Read second and ordered to a third reading
H3700 (Similar To) 2016-06-09 - Read second and ordered to a third reading
H3701 (Similar To) 2016-05-25 - Committee recommended bill ought to pass and referred to the committee on House Ways and Means
S1994 (Similar To) 2016-02-05 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 31 of the Acts of 2016
S1993 (Similar To) 2016-02-11 - New draft substituted, see S2074
H3895 (Replaced by) 2016-08-10 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 234 of the Acts of 2016
H3699 (Similar To) 2016-06-22 - Read second and ordered to a third reading
H3700 (Similar To) 2016-06-09 - Read second and ordered to a third reading
H3701 (Similar To) 2016-05-25 - Committee recommended bill ought to pass and referred to the committee on House Ways and Means
S1994 (Similar To) 2016-02-05 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 31 of the Acts of 2016
S1993 (Similar To) 2016-02-11 - New draft substituted, see S2074
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/189/H3870 |
Text | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/189/H3870.pdf |